Bhatia, Leon (CPSO#: 111316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  02 Jan 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Jan 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Medical University of Vienna, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E6
Phone: (647) 479-5764
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leon Bhatia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bhatia ( CPSO# 111316)

Business Address:
103 - 9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E6
Phone Number: (647) 479-5764

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jan 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Leon  Bhatia may practise family medicine at 9160 Bayview Avenue, in
                  Richmond  Hill,   Ontario,  while  under  supervision  coordinated  by  a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires three years from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Bhatia's  knowledge,  skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to  the  College  by  the  due  date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Bhatia's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on January 3, 2017, and will expire  on  or
                  before January 2, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.