Bhatia, Rajdeep Singh (CPSO#: 63522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Regent Street
St. John's NL  A1A 5A4
Phone: 709 777-7102
Fax: 709 777-2128

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJDEEP SINGH BHATIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1993