Bhatt, Devendra Shankerprasad (CPSO#: 27142)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Makerere Univ, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 325-4414
Fax: (705) 330-0250
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Devendra S. Bhatt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bhatt ( CPSO# 27142 )

Business Address:
104B - 119 Memorial Avenue
Simcoe ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 325-4414

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEVENDRA SHANKERPRASAD BHATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1974