Bhatt, Jayant Shankerprasad (CPSO#: 26042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 May 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Swahili

Education:University College of East Africa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
53 Pine Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1G5
Phone: 6134981355
Fax: 6134981414
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

555 King St. West
Prescott ON  K0E1T0
Canada
Phone: 6139255977
Fax: 6139251238
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

1803 County Rd 2
Brockville ON  K6V5V8
Canada
Phone: 6133450255
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jayant S. Bhatt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bhatt ( CPSO# 26042 )

Business Address:
53 Pine Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1G5
Phone Number: (613) 498-1355

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  June 12, 2016
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 28, 2016, the College was notified by the Chief of Staff at Brockville General Hospital that Dr. Bhatt's hospital privileges were revoked effective June 12, 2016.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 08 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., April 4, 2016, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Jayant Shankerprasad Bhatt:


                  (i)   In his practice at any Brockville General Hospital site, Dr. Bhatt
                        is only permitted to practice in the following out-patient clinics:
                        Ambulatory Care Unit, Stroke Prevention Program and the Brockville
                        Cardiovascular Rehabilitation Program,  or in any other out-patient
                        clinic as is approved by the Chief of Staff.  Dr. Bhatt may attend
                        on patients of the above-mentioned out-patient clinics who are
                        housed on an in-patient unit solely in his capacity as a stroke
                        clinic physician.  Dr. Bhatt is also permitted to review and report
                        on diagnostic test results as authorized by the Chief of Staff of
                        the hospital;
                  
                  (ii)  Dr. Bhatt will not be alone with Nurse A;
                  
                  (iii) Dr. Bhatt will advise of any new work places within ten days of
                        starting a new position;
                  
                  (iv)  Dr .Bhatt will successfully complete the ProBE program in 2016, at
                        his own expense,  agree to abide by any recommendations of the
                        ProBE program and provide proof of completion to the College;
                  
                  (v)   Dr. Bhatt will continue seeing his treating psychiatrist on a
                        monthly basis for two years and will agree to abide by any
                        recommendations made by the treating psychiatrist.  The treating
                        psychiatrist will provide quarterly reports to the College.  After
                        two years, with the approval of his treating psychiatrist, Dr.
                        Bhatt may apply to the  College to vary the frequency of his
                        appointments; and
                  
                  (vi)  Dr. Bhatt will agree to a monitoring program, at his own expense,
                        with a monitor appointed by the College, such monitoring to be
                        conducted every four months for two years.  The monitor will
                        provide reports to the College following each monitoring visit.
                        After two years, with the approval of the monitor, Dr. Bhatt may
                        apply to the College to vary the frequency of the monitoring. Dr.
                        Bhatt will provide consent to the monitor to speak to the Chief of
                        Staff , staff, volunteers and physicians at the Brockville General
                        Hospital, for the purpose of the workplace monitoring and as
                        requested by the  monitor.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 Apr 2016
Summary:

On April 4, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons found 
that Dr. Jayant Shankerprasad Bhatt committed an act of professional misconduct in that he 
engaged in an act or omission that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Bhatt, a general internist, has practised medicine at a hospital in Ontario (“the Hospital”) 
since 1977, holding a variety of positions including Chief of Medicine and Chief of the Intensive 
Care Unit. 
 
HISTORY OF DISRUPTIVE, UNPROFESSIONAL, AND INAPPROPRIATE CONDUCT 
WITH WOMEN 
 
Dr. Bhatt has a history of disruptive, unprofessional and inappropriate conduct and behaviour 
towards female colleagues, staff, and patients in the Hospital. Dr. Bhatt accordingly had entered 
into a contract with the Hospital in 2011 setting out expectations for his behaviour and installing 
a workplace monitor. The Hospital advised that the contract had been satisfied in January 2014. 
 
In  July  2014, the  Hospital made  a  report  to  the  College  because  it had received  seven  new 
complaints  regarding Dr.  Bhatt’s behaviour. As  a  result, Dr.  Bhatt entered  into  a further 
voluntary undertaking  with  the Hospital,  agreeing to  stop  working  in  the  ICU as  well  as 
refraining from participating in on-call consultations. 
 
BEHAVIOUR TOWARD PATIENTS 
 
The College investigation revealed that patients had complained to the Hospital regarding Dr. 
Bhatt between  2008  and  2014.  Patients had also specifically requested  not  to  see  Dr.  Bhatt 
because of his unprofessional, inappropriate, and derogatory behaviour. 
 
For  example, one patient in  the  cardiovascular  program  complained  that Dr.  Bhatt had 
commented on her weight and told her, “You should keep the lights on at night so that food fairy 
doesn’t put food in your mouth,” and, “I bet you $100 that you can’t lose weight.” This patient 
felt hurt and intimidated by Dr. Bhatt’s rude and unprofessional behaviour. 
 
BEHAVIOUR TOWARD HOSPITAL COLLEAGUES AND STAFF 
 
The  College’s  investigation also  revealed  that Dr.  Bhatt  had  subjected Hospital  staff to 
inappropriate, derogatory and unprofessional behaviour between 2008 and 2014, including: 
       
   -  Dr. Bhatt behaved inappropriately and rudely to Nurse A, both privately and in front of 
      patients, including Dr. Bhatt telling Nurse A to be quiet and not to talk to patients. Nurse 
      A, on one occasion, asked Dr. Bhatt a question and Dr. Bhatt told her to “shut the fuck 
      up.” Nurse A asked Dr. Bhatt to stop behaving this way. He was better for about two days 
      but  he then reverted. Nurse A was stressed  and frightened to  the point that she had a 
      panic button installed at her work station. 
   -  Dr. Bhatt once yelled at Nurse B over the phone and she hung up. Dr. Bhatt then tried to 
      call Nurse B at home. Later, Dr. Bhatt tried to go through Nurse B’s husband to discuss 
      the issue. Nurse B has observed Dr. Bhatt corner women in rooms who come out crying 
      after speaking with him. 
   -  Dr. Bhatt yelled at Nurse C, an RN with 30 years of experience, regarding paperwork. Dr. 
      Bhatt suggested she would go to jail, which made Nurse C cry – the first doctor to do so 
      in her 30-year career. Nurse C has observed Dr. Bhatt’s rude and demeaning treatment of 
      staff and patients and has reported his behaviour on several occasions to management. 
   -  Nurse  D has  worked  with  Dr.  Bhatt  for  28  years,  and described  having  to adjust  to 
      whatever mood Dr. Bhatt happens to be in. Dr. Bhatt has called Nurse D a “monster.” 
      Nurse D told Dr. Bhatt to stop calling her this name but Dr. Bhatt continued to do so. 
      Although she did not feel physically endangered by him, Dr. Bhatt once hit Nurse D with 
      a patient chart. Dr. Bhatt has called Nurse D “stupid” and “useless” in public. Nurse D 
      has  received  numerous  patient  complaints  about  Dr.  Bhatt and has  had patients 
      specifically ask not to see him. 
   -  Dr. Bhatt interfered with Dr. X’s care of a patient in the ER. Dr. Bhatt aggressively stated 
      that  the  patient  was  not  being  cared  for  properly  and instructed Dr.  X to  remove  the 
      patient’s  family  from  the  room.  Dr.  Bhatt  also was demeaning  to  a  nurse  who  was 
      tending  to  the  patient. The next  day,  Dr.  Bhatt  again  spoke  to Dr.  X about  the  same 
      patient’s care in a threatening, abusive, and condescending manner. Dr. X received and 
      felt intimidated by multiple telephone calls from Dr. Bhatt in the days following which 
      she neither answered nor returned. She also reported that patients specifically ask not to 
      see Dr. Bhatt because he is rude and demeaning.  
   -  Ms. E, a volunteer member of the District Hospital Foundation, received complaints from 
      donors that Dr. Bhatt had pressured them to donate to the local Cardiovascular Program. 
      Dr. Bhatt came to see Ms. E to complain that a recent donation was too small and that he 
      could get more money. Ms. E tried to explain the donor’s position, but Dr. Bhatt became 
      rude and used foul language. Ms. E wrote to the Hospital CEO to express her concerns 
      about this interaction. Subsequently, Dr. Bhatt came to see Ms. E. and closed her office 
      door. Dr. Bhatt handed Ms. E a donation and asked her why she had written the letter of 
      complaint to the Hospital. Ms. E refused to discuss her complaint with Dr. Bhatt. She felt 
      fearful and described his behaviour as bullying. 
       
POST-REFERRAL CONDUCT 
 
In the fall of 2015, after the above matters had been referred to the Discipline Committee, the 
Hospital asked Dr. Bhatt to assist in in-patients consultations, which Dr. Bhatt had not done since 
his October 2014 undertaking with the Hospital.  
 
In October 2015, a newly-qualified female doctor at the Hospital, Dr. Y, reported to the Chief of 
Staff that she had experienced an unpleasant and unprofessional interaction with Dr. Bhatt. The 
Chief of Staff reported the complaint to the College for investigation, which disclosed that  
Dr. Y’s first interaction with Dr. Bhatt was a phone call in which Dr. Bhatt was abrupt, curt, and 
questioned Dr. Y’s management of the patient they were discussing. Dr. Y felt that Dr. Bhatt was 
suggesting that she did not know what she was doing and was not taking appropriate care of the 
patient. Dr. Y felt professionally threatened when Dr. Bhatt said words to the effect that “the 
patient’s family will not be happy,” and suggested that the care Dr. Y was providing was not “up 
to par.” After the incident, Dr. Y felt anxious and concerned. 
       
After the above incident, the Hospital and Dr. Bhatt agreed that Dr. Bhatt would no longer do in-
patient consultations. 
       
ORDER 
 
The Discipline Committee directed the Registrar to: 
   -  suspend Dr. Bhatt’s Certificate of Registration for a four month period effective April 8, 
      2016 at midnight (12:00 a.m.); and 
   -  impose  the following terms,  conditions and  limitations  on  Dr.  Bhatt’s Certificate  of 
      Registration: 
         o  In his practice at the Hospital site, Dr. Bhatt is only permitted to practice in the 
            following out-patient clinics:  Ambulatory Care Unit, Stroke Prevention Program 
            and the Cardiovascular Rehabilitation Program,  or in any other out-patient clinic 
            as  is  approved  by  the  Chief  of  Staff.  Dr.  Bhatt  may  attend  on  patients  of  the 
            above-mentioned out-patient clinics who are housed on an in-patient unit solely in 
            his capacity as a stroke clinic physician.  Dr. Bhatt is also permitted to review and 
            report on diagnostic test results as authorized by the Chief of Staff of the hospital; 
         o  Dr. Bhatt will not be alone with Nurse A; 
         o  Dr. Bhatt will advise of any new work places within ten days of starting a new 
            position; 
         o  Dr. Bhatt  will  successfully  complete  the  ProBE  program  in  2016,  at  his  own 
            expense,  agree  to  abide  by  any  recommendations  of  the  ProBE  program  and 
            provide proof of completion to the College; 
         o  Dr. Bhatt will continue seeing his treating psychiatrist on a monthly basis for two 
            years  and  will  agree  to  abide  by  any  recommendations  made  by  the  treating 
            psychiatrist.  The  treating  psychiatrist  will  provide  quarterly  reports  to  the 
            College.  After two years, with the approval of his treating psychiatrist, Dr. Bhatt 
            may apply to the  College to vary the frequency of his appointments; and 
         o  Dr. Bhatt will agree to a monitoring program, at his own expense, with a monitor 
            appointed by the College, such monitoring to be conducted every four months for 
            two  years.  The  monitor  will  provide  reports  to  the  College  following  each 
            monitoring visit. After two years, with the approval of the monitor, Dr. Bhatt may 
            apply  to  the  College  to  vary  the  frequency  of  the  monitoring.  Dr.  Bhatt  will 
            provide consent to the monitor to speak to the Chief of Staff , staff, volunteers and 
            physicians at the Brockville General Hospital, for the purpose of the workplace 
            monitoring and as requested by the  monitor 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Bhatt: 
   -  to appear before the panel to be reprimanded; and 
   -  to pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000.00 within thirty (30) days of the date 
      of this Order. 
 
Dr. Bhatt signed the waiver of appeal and the Discipline Committee subsequently administered 
the reprimand to Dr. Bhatt on April 4, 2016.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): April 4, 2016