Bhatt, Maala (CPSO#: 73004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHEO, Division of Emergency Medicin
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAALA BHATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 1998 to 13 Sep 1998
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 13 Mar 1999 to 11 Apr 1999
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2010