Bhattacharya, Ashok (CPSO#: 54950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
305 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6J 1J3
Phone: (905) 844-4825
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bhattacharya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bhattacharya ( CPSO# 54950 )

Business Address:
202 - 305 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6J 1J3
Phone Number: (905) 844-4825

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHOK BHATTACHARYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATTACHARYA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Sep 1984 to 25 Oct 1984
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2005

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Oct 2002
Summary:

 On October 17, 2002, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bhattacharya guilty of incompetence in his 
 care and treatment of a patient.

The penalty hearing took place on December 20, 2002.  The 
 Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.  The Registrar shall impose the following 
 terms and limitations on Dr. Bhattacharya(s certificate of registration:

a) Dr. Bhattacharya 
 shall only practise under the supervision of a physician supervisor approved by the Registrar.  
 The physician supervisor shall sign a written monitoring agreement acceptable to the Registrar and 
 provide written reports to the Registrar quarterly; such reports to state whether Dr. Bhattacharya 
 is practising at an acceptable standard of care and to comment on the adequacy of clinical 
 records.

b) Dr. Bhattacharya shall submit a written report for every new patient on the history 
 diagnosis and treatment plan for that patient within a reasonable time, such time to be determined 
 by the supervisor.

c) Dr. Bhattacharya shall meet with the supervisor monthly to discuss 
 treatment plans for new and current patients.  Dr. Bhattacharya shall make his charts available to 
 the supervisor to review for this purpose or for any other purpose considered appropriate by the 
 supervisor in order to fulfill his/her responsibilities.

d) The supervisor shall submit quarterly 
 reports to the Registrar on the results of the supervision.

e) Dr. Bhattacharya shall bear the 
 costs of the supervision.

f)  Dr. Bhattacharya shall successfully complete the College(s 
 Boundaries Course within one year at his own expense.

g) After three years from the date of this 
 Order, the Registrar may terminate the terms, conditions and limitations set out in this order if 
 the reports received from the supervisor are satisfactory to the Registrar.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 20, 2002