Bhavsar, Swati Pravin (CPSO#: 42464)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Bhausar, Swati Pravin (used until: 26 Sep 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Gujarat University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014