Bhayana, Shelly (CPSO#: 74686)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Aug 2005