Bhella, Sita Devi (CPSO#: 88326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Departments of Medicine & Oncology
Room 2025 Etherington Hall
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 7665
Fax: (613) 546-8201
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sita D. Bhella Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhella ( CPSO# 88326 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Medicine and Oncology
Room 2025-Etherington Hall
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5N6
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SITA DEVI BHELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHELLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2013