Bhesania, Teosar (CPSO#: 55501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medicine Professional Corporation
Suite 104
200 Ronson Dr.
Etobicoke
Toronto ON  M9W 5Z9
Phone: (416) 748-9183
Fax: (416) 748-9184
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Bhesania Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bhesania ( CPSO# 55501 )

Business Address:
104 - 200 Ronson Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 5Z9
Phone Number: (416) 748-9183

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TEOSAR BHESANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHESANIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1989