Bhide, Devayanee Madhusudan (CPSO#: 42493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Nagpur University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health Services
Clarke Site
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 2180
Fax: (416) 979-8501
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEVAYANEE MADHUSUDAN BHIDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHIDE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1992