Bhimani, Devin (CPSO#: 102087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oshawa Medical Centre
1400 Ritson Road North
Suite 205
Oshawa ON  L1G 7W4
Phone: (905) 404 0372
Fax: (905) 433 2108
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ellesmere Health Care Centre
2060 Ellesmere Rd
Unit 1
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Canada
Phone: (416) 439 2273
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Taunton Mills RH and LTC
3800 Brock St N
Whitby ON  L1R 3A5
Canada
Phone: 905-666-3156 Ext. 5905
Fax: 905-666-3156
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Devin Bhimani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bhimani ( CPSO# 102087)

Business Address:
North Oshawa Medical Centre
Suite 205
1400 Ritson Road North
Oshawa ON  L1G 7W4
Phone Number: (905) 404-0372

Business Address:
Ellesmere Health Care Centre
Suite 1
2060 Ellesmere Road North
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 439-2273

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Sep 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEVIN BHIMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHIMANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2013 to 22 Dec 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2015