Bhimani, Munsif Ali (CPSO#: 77658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Swahili

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: (519) 667-6769
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

South Huron Hospital Emergency Dept
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Canada
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhimani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bhimani ( CPSO# 77658 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Business Address:
South Huron Hospital
23 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-3343

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUNSIF ALI BHIMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHIMANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004