Bhimji, Khadija (CPSO#: 62286)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1991


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
Palliative Care Program
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 737-7700
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khadija Bhimji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2010

Dr. K. Bhimji ( CPSO# 62286 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. KHADIJA BHIMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHIMJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2003 to 13 Jan 2004
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1991