Bhoi, Paramjit Singh (CPSO#: 22553)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. S. Bhoi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 18-1910 St Laurent Boulevard Ottawa ON K1G 1A4
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017