Bhupal, Vipul Kumar (CPSO#: 59626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
265 Scarlett Road
Toronto ON  M6N 4L1
Phone: (416) 604-4000
Fax: (416) 604-2982
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vipul Bhupal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bhupal ( CPSO# 59626 )

Business Address:
265 Scarlett Road
Toronto ON  M6N 4L1
Phone Number: (416) 604-4000

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIPUL KUMAR BHUPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHUPAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2016

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Jun 2014
Summary:

On June 6, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Vipul Kumar Bhupal committed an 
act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession. Dr. Bhupal admitted to the allegation. 
 
The referral relates to a s.75 investigation regarding the appropriateness of Dr. Bhupal's referrals 
of patients for cardiac testing to a company that rented part of his office space from him. 
 
With respect to Patient A, Dr. Bhupal ordered echocardiograms without appropriate indications, 
and failed to order a lipid profile to fully assess the patient's cardiovascular risk. Dr. Bhupal 
further failed to refer the patient to a cardiologist for a nuclear stress test following her 
echocardiograms and stress echocardiograms, and failed to maintain the standard of practice with 
respect to record keeping in that his chart lacked adequate means of tracking test results. 
 
With respect to Patient B, Dr. Bhupal ordered multiple echocardiograms and stress 
echocardiograms without sufficient indication for this patient, even after a cardiologist indicated 
they were unnecessary. Patient B underwent twelve echocardiograms over a period of five years.   
 
With respect to Patient C, Dr. Bhupal failed to order appropriate laboratory tests and ordered 
stress echocardiography without indication before conducting an appropriate history and physical 
exam for this patient who presented with palpitations.  
 
With respect to Patient D, Dr. Bhupal ordered unnecessary repeat echocardiography for this 
patient, even after consultation with a cardiologist who indicated the following: the cardiologist 
would be doing repeat tests; he does not believe the pain to be cardiac; and his impression is that 
there is nothing serious going on. Further, Dr. Bhupal failed to maintain the standard of practice 
with regard to his record keeping in that his chart contains no details of physical findings or 
history pertaining to his ordering of echocardiography and stress echocardiography for this 
patient.  
 
With respect to Patient E, Dr. Bhupal ordered stress echocardiography without appropriate 
indications in this patient with a two week history of dizziness with exertion, no chest pain or 
shortness of breath. There was no blood work, EKG or Holter, which should have been the first 
steps taken by Dr. Bhupal. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      Dr. Bhupal appear before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  
      the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Bhupal's 
      Certificate of Registration: 
 
      (i)   Within 6 months of the date of this Order, Dr. Bhupal shall undergo a 
            Comprehensive Practice Assessment by an assessor or assessors appointed by the 
            College (the "Assessor(s)").  
 
(ii)  Dr. Bhupal shall abide by any and all recommendations of the Assessor(s), 
      including with respect to any practice improvements and/or ongoing professional 
      development and/or education.  
(iii) Dr. Bhupal shall be solely responsible for all fees, costs and expenses associated 
      with his compliance with the terms of this Order.   
              
Dr. Bhupal pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460, within thirty (30) days of the 
date of this Order. 
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 6, 2014