Biagi, James Joseph (CPSO#: 69087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of
Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2630 Ext. 4503
Fax: (613) 546-8201
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Biagi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fuller ( CPSO# 54411 )
Dr. J. Biagi ( CPSO# 69087 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2630

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES JOSEPH BIAGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIAGI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1999