Biagioni, Eugene Mario (CPSO#: 18325)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2006