Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bialik, Mark Joseph (CPSO#: 57253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 107
900 Greenbank Road
Nepean ON  K2J 1S8
Phone: (613) 825-7151
Fax: (613) 825-5705
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Bialik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bialik ( CPSO# 57253 )

Business Address:
Suite 107
900 Greenbank Road
Nepean ON  K2J 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 825-7151

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK JOSEPH BIALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIALIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987