Bialik, Sean Joseph (CPSO#: 60905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinic 461
461 Dundas Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 1C2
Phone: (519) 421-9557
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Bialik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bialik ( CPSO# 60905 )

Business Address:
461 Dundas Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 1C2
Phone Number: (519) 421-9557

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN JOSEPH BIALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIALIK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990