Bianchi, Fernando Anthony (CPSO#: 17503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 1963

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 1963


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Charlton Osteoporosis &Bone Density
Suite 401
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients requesting a copy of their medical record may contact Records Xpress at telephone: 416-849-5991.
Date Received: 28 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. FERNANDO ANTHONY BIANCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIANCHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1960
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Mar 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1963