Bibr, Henry Jindrich (CPSO#: 61918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6040
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRY JINDRICH BIBR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIBR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1994