Bicamumpaka, Cyrille (CPSO#: 85583)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universite Nationale De Rwanda, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 07 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 07 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 08 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2010 to 06 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2011