Bickle, Robert Graham (CPSO#: 59530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
125 Bellfarm Road
Suite 003
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: (705) 721-5991
Fax: (705) 728-5936
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert G. Bickle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2005

Dr. R. Bickle ( CPSO# 59530 )

Business Address:
003 - 125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 721-5991


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ROBERT GRAHAM BICKLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BICKLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989