Bicknell, Ryan Terence (CPSO#: 74692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Watkins 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6597
Fax: (613) 548-2433
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.T. Bicknell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bicknell ( CPSO# 74692 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Watkins 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN TERENCE BICKNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BICKNELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2007