Biddulph, Michael Paul (CPSO#: 83869)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2005 to 14 Dec 2005
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009