Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bidinot, Hugo Luigi (CPSO#: 30877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Turnberry Court
St Thomas ON  N5R 0G2
Phone: (519) 631-8888
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H.L. Bidinot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bidinot ( CPSO# 30877 )

Business Address:
18 Turnberry Court
St Thomas ON  N5R 0G2
Phone Number: (416) 631-8888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUGO LUIGI BIDINOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIDINOT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1979