Bidmead, Nicholas Rodney (CPSO#: 30911)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Mar 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010