Biehl, Diane Ruth (CPSO#: 23622)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jan 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006