Bielas, Katarzyna Ewa (CPSO#: 98336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
104-1807 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 5C2
Phone: 519-432-6318
Fax: 519-432-9880
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Bielas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bielas ( CPSO# 98336 )

Business Address:
1807 Wonderland Road North
Suite 104
London ON  N6G 5C2
Phone Number: (519) 432-6318

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Apr 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATARZYNA EWA BIELAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIELAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Jan 2015 to 06 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2015