Biem, Henry Jay (CPSO#: 58695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeshore General Hospital
160 Stillview Avenue
Pointe-Claire QC  H9R 2Y2
Phone: (514) 630-2225

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRY JAY BIEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2005