Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Biem, Sandra Ruth Derksen (CPSO#: 58657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
955 Boul. St. Jean suite 200
Pointe Claire QC  H9R 5K3
Phone: (514) 426-6677
Fax: (514) 426-3323

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA RUTH DERKSEN BIEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIEM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2005