Bienenstock, Audrie Marie (CPSO#: 42407)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: McMaster Medical Centre 1200 Main Street West Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5 St. Joseph's Health Care - Hamilton 50 Charlton Avenue East Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Date Received: 25 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016