Bier, Anthony Blackwell (CPSO#: 69086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6414
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Bier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bier ( CPSO# 69086 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Business Address:
Suite 103
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone Number: (519) 837-1401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY BLACKWELL BIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1997