Bier, Norman Blackwell (CPSO#: 19748)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 2008