Biernacka, Magdalena Teresa (CPSO#: 72207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aberdeen Hospital
835 East River Road
New Glasgow NS  B2H 3S6
Phone: (902) 752-7600 Ext. 2930
Fax: (902) 752-6631

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGDALENA TERESA BIERNACKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIERNACKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2005