Bigam, David Lee (CPSO#: 69747)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1996 to 16 Feb 1996
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Feb 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Oct 1999