Bigelow, Eric (CPSO#: 66653)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 311
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 274-7457
Fax: (613) 274-7535
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

almonte general hospital
75 spring street
almonte, ontario
Ottawa ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: (613) 256-2500
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hopital Monfort-National Defence
713 chemin de Montreal
Ottawa Ontario
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 945-1551
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Bigelow Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bigelow ( CPSO# 66653 )

Business Address:
311 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 274-7457

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  January 4, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On January 4, 2017, Queensway Carleton Hospital notified the College that in March 2016, Dr. Eric Bigelow voluntarily agreed to restrict his hospital privileges by ceasing call, ACS service and diverticulitis cases pending an external review of Dr. Bigelow's practice.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC BIGELOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIGELOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2003