Biggar, Ruth Ann (CPSO#: 43790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5488 Woodeden Drive
Manotick ON  K4M 1B4
Phone: (613) 692-0610
Fax: (613) 692-1402
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Biggar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Biggar ( CPSO# 43790 )

Business Address:
5488 Woodeden Drive
Manotick ON  K4M 1B4
Phone Number: (613) 692-0610

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH ANN BIGGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIGGAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 1980 to 23 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1987