Biggar, William Douglas (CPSO#: 21269)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas Biggar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017