Bigham, Aaron Thomas (CPSO#: 84776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone: (519) 290-9001
Fax: (519) 290-9002
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Bigham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bigham ( CPSO# 84776 )
Dr. G. Bigham ( CPSO# 30076 )

Business Address:
104 - 333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone Number: (519) 290-9001

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON THOMAS BIGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIGHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011