Bignell, Douglas Cyril (CPSO#: 50153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
955 Queen Street East
Suite 230
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone: (705) 759-3098
Fax: (705) 759-8477
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-1234
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Bignell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bignell ( CPSO# 50153 )

Business Address:
Suite 230
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 759-3098

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS CYRIL BIGNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIGNELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984