Bihun, Julia Anne Patricia (CPSO#: 62638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
99 Kakulu Road
Suite 204
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone: (613) 592-1269
Fax: (613) 592-1141
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia A. Bihun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bihun ( CPSO# 62638 )

Business Address:
204-99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 592-1269

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA ANNE PATRICIA BIHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIHUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1991