Bikangaga, Peter Mwesigye (CPSO#: 61555)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Makerere Univ, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
157 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3X4
Phone: (905) 456-5656
Fax: (905) 456-9572
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter M. Bikangaga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bikangaga ( CPSO# 61555 )

Business Address:
Suite 207
157 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3X4
Phone Number: (905) 456-5656

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 13 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MWESIGYE BIKANGAGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIKANGAGA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1995