Bilawski, Darlene Ann (CPSO#: 55527)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1987


Former Name: Schellert, Darlene Ann (used until: 28 Dec 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
359 Talbot St
St Thomas ON  N5P 1B7
Phone: (519) 633-7989
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darlene Bilawski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2009

Dr. D. Bilawski ( CPSO# 55527 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. DARLENE ANN BILAWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILAWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987