Bilbao, Juan Manuel (CPSO#: 27303)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of La Plata, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 24 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 12 Apr 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017