Bilbily, Matthew Fady Janan (CPSO#: 106308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:New York Univ School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janan Bilbily Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bilbily ( CPSO# 72898 )
Dr. M. Bilbily ( CPSO# 106308)

Business Address:
1801 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1R 2X9
Phone Number: (416) 532-5325

Business Address:
Milner Health Centre
857 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N6
Phone Number: (416) 287-3611

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW FADY JANAN BILBILY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BILBILY is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. BILBILY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BILBILY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BILBILY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BILBILY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BILBILY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 26 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018