Bilibajkich, Mara Melinda (CPSO#: 66940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 203
13278 tecumseh rd e
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 727-3338
Fax: (519) 9567555
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mara Bilibajkich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bilibajkich ( CPSO# 66940 )

Business Address:
203-13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 727-3338

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARA MELINDA BILIBAJKICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILIBAJKICH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2002