Billing, Suzanne Lindheimer (CPSO#: 62514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Student Health Service
LaSalle Building
146 Stuart St.
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-6000 Ext. 74936
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.L. Billing Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Billing ( CPSO# 62514 )

Business Address:
775 Strand Boulevard
Kingston ON  K7P 2P1
Phone Number: (613) 544-5506

Business Address:
Queens University
La Salle Building
146 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE LINDHEIMER BILLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILLING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1991