Billinghurst, John Craig (CPSO#: 25778)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Dec 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Apr 2005